TX HB1861 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Commission on State Emergency Communications.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Commission on State Emergency Communications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-17 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Passed | |
2011-05-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-17 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-18 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-15 | Record vote | |
2011-04-15 | Passed | |
2011-04-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-02-25 | Filed |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
STATE EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
STATE EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills