TX HB1906 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedures for the alternative assessment of certain public school students that receive special education services and alternative accountability plans for certain campuses serving students that receive special education services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures for the alternative assessment of certain public school students that receive special education services and alternative accountability plans for certain campuses serving students that receive special education services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#873 (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-03SenateReferred to Education
2019-05-03SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#873
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-01HouseAmended 1-Hinojosa and Burns
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback