TX HB1960 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the payment for an appearance as a witness for certain peace officers and firefighters.
Title
Relating to the payment for an appearance as a witness for certain peace officers and firefighters.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Valinda Bolton [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Rep. Diana Maldonado [D] | Rep. Robert Miklos [D] | Rep. Kristi Thibaut [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-13 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |