TX HB1978 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to discounts provided by package store and wine only package store permit holders on the purchase of alcoholic beverages.
Title
Relating to discounts provided by package store and wine only package store permit holders on the purchase of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2023-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1678 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
SB1678 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
SB1678 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar