TX HB200 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to continuing education requirements for public school principals.
Title
Relating to continuing education requirements for public school principals.
Sponsors
Rep. Al Edwards [D] | Rep. Joe Heflin [D] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Education | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-06 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-12 | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel