TX HB2004 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the dismissal of certain actions relating to Medicaid fraud.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the dismissal of certain actions relating to Medicaid fraud.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#618 (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-21 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-10HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-09HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-08HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenatePassed
2019-05-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Administration
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-25SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#618
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1899 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback