TX HB2048 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the repeal of the driver responsibility program and the amount and allocation of state traffic fine funds; eliminating program surcharges; authorizing and increasing criminal fines; increasing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the repeal of the driver responsibility program and the amount and allocation of state traffic fine funds; eliminating program surcharges; authorizing and increasing criminal fines; increasing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1724 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Amended RV#887 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Amended RV#855 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1724
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-17HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateAmended
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Huffman
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateAmended
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Huffman
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateAmended
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-06SenateReferred to Finance
2019-05-06SenateRead first time
2019-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#887
2019-05-02HousePassed as amended
2019-05-02HouseAmended 1-Krause
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01HouseRecord vote RV#855
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-01HouseAmended 5-Darby
2019-05-01HouseAmended 4-Krause
2019-05-01HouseAmended 3-Howard
2019-05-01HouseAmended 2-Krause
2019-05-01HouseAmended 1-Zerwas
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB918 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2048
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02048I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02048H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02048E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02048S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02048F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2048&RcdVtNo=855&Ch=H&Dt=05/01/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2048&RcdVtNo=887&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=20
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2048&RcdVtNo=1724&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2019

Bill Comments

feedback