TX HB2051 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the oath taken by a person who assists a voter.
Title
Relating to the oath taken by a person who assists a voter.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Aliseda [R] | Rep. John Garza [R] | Rep. Donald Margo [R] | Rep. Aaron Pena [D] |
Rep. Raul Torres [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-03 | Recommitted to committee | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Elections | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Filed |