TX HB2083 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the transfer of civil cases by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the transfer of civil cases by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB827 (Same As) 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback