TX HB2112 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to priority groundwater management areas.
Title
Relating to priority groundwater management areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-04-19 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB2112 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB02112I.htm |