TX HB2112 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the valuation used to compute the sales and use tax imposed on the sale of certain motor vehicles.
Title
Relating to the valuation used to compute the sales and use tax imposed on the sale of certain motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |