TX HB2151 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consideration by the board of trustees of a school district of parental complaints concerning student participation in extracurricular activities.
Title
Relating to consideration by the board of trustees of a school district of parental complaints concerning student participation in extracurricular activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts