TX HB2190 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Summary
Relating to an adult diabetes education program in certain county hospital systems and hospital districts.
Title
Relating to an adult diabetes education program in certain county hospital systems and hospital districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-07 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Subjects
DIABETES
DIABETES COUNCIL, TEXAS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
DIABETES COUNCIL, TEXAS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance