TX HB2287 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to data collection and receipt of certain reports by and consultation with the Collaborative Task Force on Public School Mental Health Services.
Title
Relating to data collection and receipt of certain reports by and consultation with the Collaborative Task Force on Public School Mental Health Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1668 (Y: 95 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#804 (Y: 98 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#804 (Y: 98 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1668 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Powell |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#804 |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed |
2021-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-05 | House | Amended 2-Leman |
2021-05-05 | House | Amended 1-Leman |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB920 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Education
Subjects
COLLABORATIVE TASK FORCE ON PUBLIC SCHOOL MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
Mental Health & Substance Abuse