TX HB2309 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to reporting of certain information regarding foreclosure sales of residential real property.
Title
Relating to reporting of certain information regarding foreclosure sales of residential real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-09 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-03-16 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-16 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB980 (Same As) 2009-03-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Consumer Protection
County Government
County Government--General
FORECLOSURES
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Business & Commerce--General
Consumer Protection
County Government
County Government--General
FORECLOSURES
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens