TX HB2327 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to preauthorization of certain medical care and health care services by certain health benefit plan issuers and to the regulation of utilization review, independent review, and peer review for health benefit plan and workers' compensation coverage.
Title
Relating to preauthorization of certain medical care and health care services by certain health benefit plan issuers and to the regulation of utilization review, independent review, and peer review for health benefit plan and workers' compensation coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1988 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#611 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#611 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1988 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2191 |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-24 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#611 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended 1-Zerwas |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1186 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Health Care Providers
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Interim Studies
INTERNET
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Interim Studies
INTERNET
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE