TX HB2353 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of Saint George Place Management District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments.
Title
Relating to the creation of Saint George Place Management District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-15 - House - HB 2353Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-15 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-15 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-15 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-08 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
SAINT GEORGE PLACE MANAGEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous