TX HB2392 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to applicants for employment at assisted living facilities.
Title
Relating to applicants for employment at assisted living facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB898 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Nursing Homes
Safety
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Nursing Homes
Safety