TX HB241 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the notice provided by the chief appraiser of an appraisal district of the availability of agreement forms authorizing certain electronic communications.
Title
Relating to the notice provided by the chief appraiser of an appraisal district of the availability of agreement forms authorizing certain electronic communications.
Sponsors
Rep. John Otto [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-03 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-03-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-03-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2012-12-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
PUBLIC NOTICE
REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
PUBLIC NOTICE
REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts