TX HB2424 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training and certification requirements for inspectors of public swimming pools, including spas, and artificial swimming lagoons.
Title
Relating to training and certification requirements for inspectors of public swimming pools, including spas, and artificial swimming lagoons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1308 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1308 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Objections withdrawn |
2023-05-09 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed |