TX HB2455 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an annual occupational medical examination for fire fighters.
Title
Relating to an annual occupational medical examination for fire fighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#447 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#447 |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 1-T. King |
2023-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1626 (Similar To) 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
SB1626 (Similar To) 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
SB1626 (Similar To) 2023-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
FIRE PROTECTION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
FIRE PROTECTION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions