TX HB2506 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 734 in Austin as the Master Sergeant Jonathan J. Dunbar Memorial Parkway.
Title
Relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 734 in Austin as the Master Sergeant Jonathan J. Dunbar Memorial Parkway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1134 |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1134 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
AUSTIN, CITY OF
Highways
MASTER SERGEANT JONATHAN J. DUNBAR MEMORIAL PARKWAY
SERGEANT JONATHAN J. DUNBAR MEMORIAL PARKWAY
Highways
MASTER SERGEANT JONATHAN J. DUNBAR MEMORIAL PARKWAY
SERGEANT JONATHAN J. DUNBAR MEMORIAL PARKWAY