TX HB252 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Status: Introduced on November 17 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Summary
Relating to authorizing the appointment of students to serve as election clerks.
Title
Relating to authorizing the appointment of students to serve as election clerks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Elections | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-11-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1134 (Similar To) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
SECRETARY OF STATE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
SECRETARY OF STATE