TX HB2573 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion in the definition of a medical and dental unit of the Dell Medical School at The University of Texas at Austin and the School of Medicine at The University of Texas Rio Grande Valley and the participation of those schools in the Joint Admission Medical Program.
Title
Relating to the inclusion in the definition of a medical and dental unit of the Dell Medical School at The University of Texas at Austin and the School of Medicine at The University of Texas Rio Grande Valley and the participation of those schools in the Joint Admission Medical Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB479 (Same As) 2019-06-07 - Effective immediately
Subjects
DELL MEDICAL SCHOOL AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
JOINT ADMISSION MEDICAL PROGRAM COUNCIL
SCHOOL OF MEDICINE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT RIO GRANDE VALLEY
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
JOINT ADMISSION MEDICAL PROGRAM COUNCIL
SCHOOL OF MEDICINE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT RIO GRANDE VALLEY
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2573 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02573I.htm |