TX HB2618 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exception to disclosure under the public information law of certain personal information contained in a citation issued for a violation of a state traffic law or local traffic ordinance.
Title
Relating to the exception to disclosure under the public information law of certain personal information contained in a citation issued for a violation of a state traffic law or local traffic ordinance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-16 | House | No action taken in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |