TX HB2629 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a registry for and requiring the registration of certain unmanned teller machines; imposing a fee; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a registry for and requiring the registration of certain unmanned teller machines; imposing a fee; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1123 (Y: 86 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1123 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AUTOMATED TELLER MACHINES
BANKING, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Electronic Information Systems
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
BANKING, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Electronic Information Systems
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General