TX HB2637 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to supreme court orders for conducting court proceedings during a disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to supreme court orders for conducting court proceedings during a disaster.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback