TX HB2706 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the emergency services and care provided to victims of sexual assault and other sex offenses and to the processes associated with preserving and analyzing the evidence of those offenses.
Title
Relating to the emergency services and care provided to victims of sexual assault and other sex offenses and to the processes associated with preserving and analyzing the evidence of those offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1653 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#610 (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amended RV#570 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#610 (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amended RV#570 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1653 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#610 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#570 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Amended 2-A. Johnson |
2021-04-29 | House | Amended 1-Howard |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1299 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EVIDENCE
FORENSIC TESTING
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL ASSAULT
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EVIDENCE
FORENSIC TESTING
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL ASSAULT