TX HB2716 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to exempting certain entities providing emergency services from motor fuel taxes.
Title
Relating to exempting certain entities providing emergency services from motor fuel taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB254 (Similar To) 2009-05-26 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
SB1101 (Same As) 2009-03-13 - Referred to Finance
SB1101 (Same As) 2009-03-13 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels