TX HB2722 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to special purpose territory of the Port of Beaumont Navigation District of Jefferson County, Texas.
Title
Relating to special purpose territory of the Port of Beaumont Navigation District of Jefferson County, Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1643 |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1643 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
PORT OF BEAUMONT NAVIGATION DISTRICT OF JEFFERSON COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports