TX HB2773 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Energy Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Energy Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a prohibition on the issuance by the Railroad Commission of Texas of a permit for a commercial surface disposal facility located near a school.
Title
Relating to a prohibition on the issuance by the Railroad Commission of Texas of a permit for a commercial surface disposal facility located near a school.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1499 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Environment
Environment--General
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Environment
Environment--General
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2773 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02773I.htm |