TX HB2788 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Left pending in committee
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of counties and emergency services districts.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of counties and emergency services districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-21 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-04 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1621 (Same As) 2009-05-14 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Subjects
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous