TX HB2811 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prescribing of controlled substances and dangerous drugs for acute pain.
Title
Relating to the prescribing of controlled substances and dangerous drugs for acute pain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#845 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#845 |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-30 | House | Amended 1-Price |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
INFORMED CONSENT
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
INFORMED CONSENT
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse