TX HB2831 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the service of notice of a special commissioners' hearing in an eminent domain proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the service of notice of a special commissioners' hearing in an eminent domain proceeding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1331 (Y: 123 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseCorrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-24SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-24SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-24HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-24HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-24HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1331
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback