TX HB2871 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment by The University of Texas at Austin of a program to promote computer science education capacity in this state.
Title
Relating to the establishment by The University of Texas at Austin of a program to promote computer science education capacity in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. John Bucy [D] |
Rep. Suleman Lalani [D] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#545 (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Read 2nd time RV#499 (Y: 109 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Read 2nd time RV#499 (Y: 109 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported from s/c with no recommendation |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#545 |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#499 |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Education
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Science & Technology
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
Education
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Science & Technology
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN