TX HB2955 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to oversight of specialty court programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to oversight of specialty court programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#610 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#610
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback