TX HB2957 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to periodic occupational cancer screenings for firefighters.
Title
Relating to periodic occupational cancer screenings for firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#727 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#727 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-27 | House | Amended 1-Bumgarner |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CANCER
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Political Subdivisions
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Political Subdivisions