TX HB301 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on November 19 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to discovery in a criminal case.
Title
Relating to discovery in a criminal case.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-17 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-02-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-11-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1686 (Same As) 2009-03-20 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB1168 (Same As) 2009-03-04 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
HB1168 (Same As) 2009-03-04 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair