TX HB3010 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing and financing certain sports and community venue projects.
Title
Relating to authorizing and financing certain sports and community venue projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-03-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AIRPORTS
Amusements, Games, Sports
BORDER
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Amusements, Games, Sports
BORDER
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES