TX HB3060 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for the offense of tampering with a witness and the evidence that may be offered to show that offense.
Title
Relating to the punishment for the offense of tampering with a witness and the evidence that may be offered to show that offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-05-07 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |