TX HB307 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the posting of the Ten Commandments in public school classrooms.
Title
Relating to the posting of the Ten Commandments in public school classrooms.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] |
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Rep. Mike Lang [R] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Jared Patterson [R] |
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Religion
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Religion