TX HB3115 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Livestock Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Livestock Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of an agriculture and rural ombudsman office.
Title
Relating to the establishment of an agriculture and rural ombudsman office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB776 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE & RURAL OMBUDSMAN OFFICE
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--Rural
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
Governor
AGRICULTURE & RURAL OMBUDSMAN OFFICE
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--Rural
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
Governor
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3115 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03115I.htm |