TX HB3156 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-11 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-11 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liability of engineers and certain business entities performing construction monitoring and inspection services for the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to liability of engineers and certain business entities performing construction monitoring and inspection services for the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#608 (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#608 (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-11 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-11 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#608 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-26 | House | Amended 1-Leach |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2179 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Left pending in committee
SB2179 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Left pending in committee
SB2179 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
ENGINEERS & ENGINEERING
Highways
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
ENGINEERS & ENGINEERING
Highways
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous