TX HB3193 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of provisions entitling certain lessees to receive a copy of a notice of appraised value delivered to a property owner by the chief appraiser of an appraisal district.
Title
Relating to the applicability of provisions entitling certain lessees to receive a copy of a notice of appraised value delivered to a property owner by the chief appraiser of an appraisal district.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1088 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts