TX HB3197 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to definition change for certain customer data, communications, and other information held in electronic storage in this state and other states by providers of electronic communications services and remote computing services.
Title
Relating to definition change for certain customer data, communications, and other information held in electronic storage in this state and other states by providers of electronic communications services and remote computing services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-01 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Electronic Information Systems
Protection of Personal Information
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES
Electronic Information Systems
Protection of Personal Information
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES