TX HB3216 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to telephone or electronic mail notification to a respondent of a complaint filed with the Texas Ethics Commission.
Title
Relating to telephone or electronic mail notification to a respondent of a complaint filed with the Texas Ethics Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Elections | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |