TX HB3238 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disease control pilot programs to reduce the risk of certain communicable diseases; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to disease control pilot programs to reduce the risk of certain communicable diseases; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth McClendon [D] | Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. John Davis [R] |
Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-03 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2013-05-03 | House | Amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-03 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-03 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2013-05-02 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2013-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2013-05-02 | House | Amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital