TX HB3293 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of powers and duties relating to driver's licenses and personal identification cards from the Department of Public Safety to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
Relating to the transfer of powers and duties relating to driver's licenses and personal identification cards from the Department of Public Safety to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB3293 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB03293I.htm |