TX HB3330 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to directing payment, after approval, of certain miscellaneous claims and judgments against the state out of funds designated by this Act; making appropriations.
Title
Relating to directing payment, after approval, of certain miscellaneous claims and judgments against the state out of funds designated by this Act; making appropriations.
Sponsors
Rep. John Otto [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-13 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-11 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-29 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |