TX HB3343 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to county participation in the enterprise zone program.
Title
Relating to county participation in the enterprise zone program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1833 (Same As) 2009-05-30 - House appoints conferees-reported
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Enterprise Zones
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
HOTELS & MOTELS
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Business & Commerce--Enterprise Zones
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
HOTELS & MOTELS
Taxation
Taxation--Sales